Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Laurie J Michelson
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:25-cv-10985
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 3:06 PM EDT
Defendant
Credit Acceptance Corporation
Plaintiff
Kimberly Carr
Represented By
Anthony I. Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/23 2:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, re1 . Response/Answer due by 5/14/2025. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TDam)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other Wed 04/23 11:40 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS. (TDam)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 04/23 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. (King, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/23 9:53 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, (Unopposed Motion) by Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Heeringa, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation (Proposed Order)
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 6:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Credit Acceptance Corporation served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 04/07 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Credit Acceptance Corporation* (JBro)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 04/07 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Kimberly Carr against Credit Acceptance Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10187248 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 04/07 3:16 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JBro)
Related: [-]