Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:25-cv-00477
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 3:08 PM EDT
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Defendant
Secretary KRISTI NOEM
U.S. Department of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Ave. SE
Washington, DC 20528
Plaintiff
C S
Represented By
Adrian N. Roe
Adrian N. Roe P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 7:09 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
35 35 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/29 1:54 PM
ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Video Status Conference previously scheduled for 05/13/25 at 10:00 AM is RESCHEDULED for 05/20/25 at 1:30 PM before Judge William S. Stickman. The Zoom invitation remains the same: https://pawd-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618639525. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/29/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
34 34 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order to Vacate Document ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/29 9:28 AM
ORDER OF COURT. The injunction hearing scheduled for 04/30/25 at 7:30 AM is CANCELED.22 Order of Court is VACATED. Video Status Conference set for 05/13/25 at 10:00 AM. Zoom invitation provided herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/29/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
33 33 respoth Response (other - do not select for response to motion) Mon 04/28 4:43 PM
RESPONSE to29 Order, Set Deadlines, filed by TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha)
Related: [-]
32 32 respoth Response (other - do not select for response to motion) Mon 04/28 3:56 PM
RESPONSE to29 Order, Set Deadlines, filed by PRATIK ADHIKARI, ARYAMAN SHANDILYA. (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Transcript Mon 04/28 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Temporary Restraining Order held on April 15, 2025 before Judge William S. Stickman IV. Court Reporter Melissa A. Moore, Telephone number 412-806-9835. Tape Number: melissamoore.courtreporter@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/5/2025. Redaction Request due 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (mam)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Fri 04/25 2:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. In the event it's necessary, Defendants are granted leave to exceed the page limit, no more than 35 pages permitted. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/25/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 2:16 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Notice to the Court due by 4/28/2025. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/25/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
28 28 motion File Excess Pages Thu 04/24 4:13 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 18, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/18 8:18 AM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion for Extension of Time. Briefs due by 4/28/2025. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/18/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/17 3:51 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction by PRATIK ADHIKARI, ARYAMAN SHANDILYA (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
25 25 order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/16 3:12 PM
OMNIBUS ORDER. The injunction hearing previously scheduled for 04/25/25 at 8:00 AM is RESCHEDULED for 04/30/25 at 7:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge William S. Stickman.23 Motion to Expedite Discovery is DENIED with an exception as outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/16/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
24 24 respoth Response in Opposition Wed 04/16 1:24 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to23 Motion to Expedite, filed by TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Expedite Wed 04/16 10:19 AM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by PRATIK ADHIKARI, ARYAMAN SHANDILYA. (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Rule 37 Certificate,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Response/Briefing Schedule ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 04/15 3:39 PM
ORDER OF COURT.7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Motion Hearing set for 04/25/25 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge William S. Stickman. Briefs to the Motion due by 04/23/25 at 4:00 PM. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/15/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 3:32 PM
ORDER OF COURT. For the reasons set forth on the record,2 Motion Seeking an Order Preventing Disclosure of Personally Identifying Information is DENIED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/15/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Sealed Document Tue 04/15 3:23 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT 5. (eca)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Sealed Document Tue 04/15 3:22 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT 4. (eca)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Sealed Document Tue 04/15 3:22 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT 3. (eca)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Sealed Document Tue 04/15 3:21 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT 2. (eca)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Sealed Document Tue 04/15 3:16 PM
SEALED EXHIBIT 1. (eca)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 04/15 3:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2025 re7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Court Reporter: Melissa Moore) (eca)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 04/15 11:36 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/15/2025 (eca)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Stewart on behalf of TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Fischer on behalf of TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Fischer, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 04/14 9:27 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by C.S., D. T.. (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 04/14 2:58 PM
Summons Issued as to TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (rtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
9 9 order Order Mon 04/14 2:42 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of8 scheduling order upon Defendants. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/14/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/14 2:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing re:7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/14/25. (eca)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/14 1:49 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by C.S., D. T.. (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 service Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 12:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Copy of Verified First Amended Complaint by C.S., D. T. re4 Amended Complaint (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Mon 04/14 11:57 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by C.S., D. T. (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Noem Summons,
Att: 2 Summons Lyons Summons,
Att: 3 Summons DHS Summons,
Att: 4 Summons ICE Summons
4 4 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/14 11:12 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, TODD LYONS, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT , filed by D. T., TODD LYONS, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Roe, Adrian) Modified text on 4/15/2025. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/10 12:06 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/10/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mwm)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/10 2:44 PM
Judge William S. Stickman added. (ert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/09 8:34 AM
Judge David S. Cercone added. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 3 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Mon 04/07 4:18 PM
MOTION Seeking an Order Preventing Disclosure of Personally Identifying Information by C S. (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 7 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Mon 04/07 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8796548), filed by C S. (Roe, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet