SHANDILYA et al v. NOEM, et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | William S Stickman |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00477 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 3:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
|
|
Defendant
Secretary KRISTI NOEM
U.S. Department of Homeland Security 2707 Martin Luther King Jr. Ave. SE
Washington, DC 20528 |
|
Plaintiff
C S
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/29 1:54 PM
ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Video Status Conference previously scheduled for 05/13/25 at 10:00 AM is RESCHEDULED for 05/20/25 at 1:30 PM before Judge William S. Stickman. The Zoom invitation remains the same: https://pawd-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618639525. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/29/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
34 | 34
![]() ORDER OF COURT. The injunction hearing scheduled for 04/30/25 at 7:30 AM is CANCELED.22 Order of Court is VACATED. Video Status Conference set for 05/13/25 at 10:00 AM. Zoom invitation provided herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/29/25. (eca) |
|
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() RESPONSE to29 Order, Set Deadlines, filed by TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha) |
|
32 | 32
![]() RESPONSE to29 Order, Set Deadlines, filed by PRATIK ADHIKARI, ARYAMAN SHANDILYA. (Roe, Adrian) |
|
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Temporary Restraining Order held on April 15, 2025 before Judge William S. Stickman IV. Court Reporter Melissa A. Moore, Telephone number 412-806-9835. Tape Number: melissamoore.courtreporter@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/5/2025. Redaction Request due 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (mam) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 04/25 2:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. In the event it's necessary, Defendants are granted leave to exceed the page limit, no more than 35 pages permitted. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/25/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
29 | 29
![]() ORDER OF COURT. Notice to the Court due by 4/28/2025. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/25/25. (eca) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/18 8:18 AM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion for Extension of Time. Briefs due by 4/28/2025. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/18/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction by PRATIK ADHIKARI, ARYAMAN SHANDILYA (Roe, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() OMNIBUS ORDER. The injunction hearing previously scheduled for 04/25/25 at 8:00 AM is RESCHEDULED for 04/30/25 at 7:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge William S. Stickman.23 Motion to Expedite Discovery is DENIED with an exception as outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/16/25. (eca) |
|
24 | 24
![]() RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to23 Motion to Expedite, filed by TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha) |
|
23 | 23
![]() MOTION to Expedite Discovery by PRATIK ADHIKARI, ARYAMAN SHANDILYA. (Roe, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER OF COURT.7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Motion Hearing set for 04/25/25 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge William S. Stickman. Briefs to the Motion due by 04/23/25 at 4:00 PM. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/15/25. (eca) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/15 3:32 PM
ORDER OF COURT. For the reasons set forth on the record,2 Motion Seeking an Order Preventing Disclosure of Personally Identifying Information is DENIED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/15/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
20 | 20
![]() SEALED EXHIBIT 5. (eca) |
|
19 | 19
![]() SEALED EXHIBIT 4. (eca) |
|
18 | 18
![]() SEALED EXHIBIT 3. (eca) |
|
17 | 17
![]() SEALED EXHIBIT 2. (eca) |
|
16 | 16
![]() SEALED EXHIBIT 1. (eca) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2025 re7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Court Reporter: Melissa Moore) (eca) |
|
14 | 14
![]() SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/15/2025 (eca) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Stewart on behalf of TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Stewart, Samantha) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Fischer on behalf of TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Fischer, Adam) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by C.S., D. T.. (Roe, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to TODD LYONS, KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (rtm) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 04/14 2:42 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of8 scheduling order upon Defendants. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/14/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) |
|
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing re:7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 04/14/25. (eca) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by C.S., D. T.. (Roe, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Copy of Verified First Amended Complaint by C.S., D. T. re4 Amended Complaint (Roe, Adrian) |
|
5 | 5
![]() PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by C.S., D. T. (Roe, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() First AMENDED COMPLAINT against KRISTI NOEM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, TODD LYONS, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT , filed by D. T., TODD LYONS, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Roe, Adrian) Modified text on 4/15/2025. (rtm) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 04/10 12:06 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/10/25. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mwm) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/10 2:44 PM
Judge William S. Stickman added. (ert) |
||
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/09 8:34 AM
Judge David S. Cercone added. (rtm) |
||
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() MOTION Seeking an Order Preventing Disclosure of Personally Identifying Information by C S. (Roe, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8796548), filed by C S. (Roe, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |