Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00615
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 1:06 PM PDT
Defendant
Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Davis
Represented By
SaraEllen McCay Hutchison
Law Office Of Saraellen Hutchison PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/13 4:50 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason P. Verhagen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Elizabeth Davis (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8976624 (Hutchison, SaraEllen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 05/06 8:29 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/27/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/10/2025, Joint Status Report due by 6/17/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
7 7 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Tue 05/06 8:26 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
6 6 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Tue 05/06 8:25 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 05/05 4:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Kymberly K. Evanson, United States District Judge. All future documents filed in this case must bear the case number ending in "KKE" and must bear the new Judge's name in the upper right-hand corner of the document. Authorized by Judge John H. Chun. (KRA)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 05/05 2:17 PM
Attorney Emily Ann Williams added for Defendant Citibank NA; per4 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/01 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John S Devlin, III on behalf of Defendant Citibank NA. (Devlin, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 service Waiver of Service Tue 04/29 9:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Citibank NA mailed on 4/10/2025 (Hutchison, SaraEllen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 11:45 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Citibank NA (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/09 11:29 AM
Judge John H. Chun added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Citibank, N.A. with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney SaraEllen McCay Hutchison added to party Elizabeth Davis(pty:pla) filed by Elizabeth Davis.(Hutchison, SaraEllen)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8918009
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons