Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:25-bk-02001
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lake Bennett Village-Ocoee, LLC
5237 Isleworth Country Club Dr
Windermere, FL 34786-8900
Represented By
Jonathan Sykes
Nardella & Nardella, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 misc Supplement Fri 04/18 3:20 PM
Supplement to Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Debtor Lake Bennett Village-Ocoee, LLC Related [+]. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 04/17 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
19 19 motion Application to Employ/Retain Wed 04/16 10:42 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
20 20 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 04/16 11:37 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Jonathan Sykes, Jesus Lozano (Debtor Atty); Audrey Aleskovsky (US Trustee Atty); Noel Boeke (Florida Regional Atty); John Elrod (US Bank Atty); RULING: Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 6:25-bk-02001 with 6:25-bk-02002 (Doc #7) - cont. to May 20, 2025 at 2:00 pm (AOCNFNG); (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
18 18 trustee Objection (Trustee) Tue 04/15 8:35 AM
Amended Objection to Motion for Joint Administration Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL Related [+]. (Aleskovsky, Audrey)
Related: [-] 7 ,16
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/14 3:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John D Elrod on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee. (Elrod, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 trustee Objection (Trustee) Mon 04/14 1:58 PM
Objection to Motion for Joint Administration Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL Related [+]. (Aleskovsky, Audrey)
Related: [-] 7
15 15 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Mon 04/14 9:12 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/5/2025 at 09:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 6/16/2025. (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proof of Service (BK) Mon 04/14 9:09 AM
Proof of Service of Order Denying as Unnecessary Motion for Leave to Attend April 15, 2025 Preliminary Hearing Remotely. Filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor Florida Regional Center, LP I Related [+]. (Boeke, Noel)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK) Sat 04/12 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
12 12 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 04/11 1:55 PM
Order Denying as Unnecessary Motion for Leave to Attend April 15, 2025 Preliminary Hearing Remotely Related [+]. Service Instructions: Noel Boeke is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Chelsea)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event) (BK) Fri 04/11 1:34 PM
Motion for Leave to Attend April 15, 2025 Preliminary Hearing Remotely Filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor Florida Regional Center, LP I Related [+]
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, April 10, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/10 11:43 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor Florida Regional Center, LP I. (Boeke, Noel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Thu 04/10 10:30 AM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Debtor Lake Bennett Village-Ocoee, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 02:30 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 court Notice of Hearing / Status Conference / Reaffirmation Hearing Wed 04/09 2:59 PM
Notice of Initial Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 04/09 1:10 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 04/15/2025 02:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 6:25-bk-02001 with 6:25-bk-02002 Doc7 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jonathan Sykes to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 9 pgs motion Motion for Joint Administration Tue 04/08 2:18 PM
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only) Tue 04/08 2:05 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Audrey M Aleskovsky on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey)
Related: [-]
assign Assign Judge to Electronically Filed Cases Tue 04/08 9:28 AM
Amended Assignment of the Honorable Grace E. Robson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case Due to related cases 6:24-bk-04490 and 6:25-bk-2002 . (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business Mon 04/07 5:58 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs misc Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Mon 04/07 5:25 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Debtor Lake Bennett Village-Ocoee, LLC. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Mon 04/07 5:19 PM
Certification of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Debtor Lake Bennett Village-Ocoee, LLC. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/07 4:45 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Debtor Lake Bennett Village-Ocoee, LLC. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/07 4:44 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Jonathan Sykes on behalf of Lake Bennett Village-Ocoee, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/5/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 08/5/2025. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Mon 04/07 4:56 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:25-bk-02001] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A79185140, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Mon 04/07 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]