Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:H Brent Brennenstuhl
Case #: 1:25-cv-00046
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Social Security Case Assignment Wed 04/09 8:58 AM
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 4/30/2025. (DeW)
Related: [-]
5 5 service SSA Notice of Service Wed 04/09 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and[LINK:General Order 2023-2:] , the Court hereby notifies the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Kentucky that a Complaint seeking judicial review has been filed. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the official notification referenced in Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions. The plaintiff does not need to serve separately a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry. No Document is attached. (DeW)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/09 8:56 AM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 4/8/2025 granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's complaint and to effectuate service on the Commissioner of Social Security and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Kentucky electronically by the process outlined in General Order No. 2023-02. cc: Counsel (DeW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/07 4:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jessica M. Lenart. (DeW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 utility Case Assignment Mon 04/07 4:44 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (DeW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Jessica M. Lenart against Commissioner of Social Security. (DeW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeal Council Action,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet