California Central District Court
Judge:Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-03013
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 3:08 PM PDT
Defendant
PFK PARTNERS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Plaintiff
John Ho
Represented By
Pamela Tsao
Ascension Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 notice Settlement Mon 05/05 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of Entire Action filed by plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 textonly MJDAP Opt-Out Expired Fri 05/02 12:51 PM
The period to decline consent to a magistrate judge has expired. No timely declination of consent has been received by the Court. Each party is deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes pursuant to the Local Rules. The case shall now proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tsn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 04/16 2:59 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Ho, upon Defendant PFK Partners L.P. served on 4/15/2025, answer due 5/6/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Linda Fareed - Authorized Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Wed 04/09 8:37 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tsn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/08 1:16 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant PFK Partners L.P. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Tue 04/08 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/07 3:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Ho, (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 04/07 3:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 04/07 3:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/07 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39457399 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff John Ho. (Attorney Pamela Tsao added to party John Ho(pty:pla))(Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Photos