Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:John W Degravelles
Referred: Richard L Bourgeois, Jr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00288
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff
Skurley Emile Nicholas
Represented By
Kevin Reeve Duck
Duck Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 05/06 11:27 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by General Motors, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person BlackRock, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person General Motors Company for General Motors, LLC. (Babin, Samantha)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 11:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC for General Motors, LLC. (Babin, Samantha)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/06 11:23 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Additional Defenses with Jury Demand by General Motors, LLC.(Babin, Samantha) Modified on 5/6/2025 to edit title of document. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 order 90 Day Conference Order Tue 04/29 4:44 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 6/12/2025 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 5/29/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/29/2025. (SGO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/15 11:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skurley Emile Nicholas. General Motors, LLC served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 3:30 PM
Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (JEG)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 04/07 2:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Skurley Emile Nicholas. (Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Complete Case Opening First) Mon 04/07 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2885488.), filed by Skurley Emile Nicholas.(Duck, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons