Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:25-mc-00022
Cause28:1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
2 2 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 1:50 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion Application for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 4/15/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/07 3:40 PM
MOTION Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1782(a) by United States of America. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2025.(Attorney Jabrina Clayton Edwards added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(aty,Edwards, Jabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of J. Edwards,
Att: 4 Exhibit Letters/Rogatory,
Att: 5 Exhibit Subpoena to JP Morgan Chase,
Att: 6 Proposed order
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/11 8:45 AM
CASE Assigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]