Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Meredith S Grabill
Case #: 2:25-bk-10676
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC
7938 Harris Ave
New Orleans, LA 70123-3735
Represented By
Tristan E. Manthey
Fishman Haygood, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
DOJ-Ust 600 S. Maestri Place Suite 840-T
New Orleans, LA 70130


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
65 65 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 4:38 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice -- Hailey W. Klabo of Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP Filed by Carey L. Menasco of Liskow & Lewis, APLC on behalf of Pataya Food Industries Ltd. (Menasco, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
64 64 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 4:37 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice -- Brian D. Darer of Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP Filed by Carey L. Menasco of Liskow & Lewis, APLC on behalf of Pataya Food Industries Ltd. (Menasco, Carey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
63 63 answer Objection Thu 05/01 4:27 PM
Objection with Certificate of Service to Above Food Ingredients, Inc.'s Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)60 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Interested Party Above Food Ingredients, Inc.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Manthey, Tristan
62 62 motion Expedite Hearing Thu 05/01 4:03 PM
Supplemental Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by Michael E. Landis of Heller, Draper & Horn, L.L.C. on behalf of Above Food Ingredients, Inc. (Landis, Michael)
Related: [-] 60 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Interested Party Above Food Ingredients, Inc.
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
61 61 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 5:18 PM
Certificate of Service MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING Filed by Above Food Ingredients, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)60 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Interested Party Above Food Ingredients, Inc.) (King, Henry
60 60 motion Expedite Hearing Wed 04/30 5:15 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by Henry A. King of King Krebs & Jurgens PLLC on behalf of Above Food Ingredients, Inc. (King, Henry)
Related: [-] 58 Generic Motion filed by Interested Party Above Food Ingredients, Inc.
Att: 1 Proposed Order
59 59 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 5:03 PM
Certificate of Service MOTION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND TO SIT FOR A RULE 2004 EXAMINATION TO ATLANTIC NATURAL FOODS, LLC AND J. DOUGLAS HINES Filed by Above Food Ingredients, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)58 Generic Motion filed by Interested Party Above Food Ingredients, Inc.) (King, Henry
58 58 motion zGeneric Motion Wed 04/30 4:58 PM
Motion TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND TO SIT FOR A RULE 2004 EXAMINATION TO ATLANTIC NATURAL FOODS, LLC AND J. DOUGLAS HINES Filed by Henry A. King of King Krebs & Jurgens PLLC on behalf of Above Food Ingredients, Inc. (King, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
57 57 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 3:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Robert Reiser & Co., Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)54 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Robert Reiser & Co., Inc.,55 Notice of Hearing filed by Interested Party Robert Reiser & Co., Inc.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Limited Service List) (Congeni, Leo
56 56 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 3:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Douglas S. Draper on behalf of Above Food Ingredients, Inc.. (Draper, Douglas)
Related: [-]
55 55 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 04/30 10:29 AM
Notice of Hearing by *SECTION A TeleConference Line: 1-504-517-1385 Access Code 129611 on Motion for Entry of Order Directing that Debtor Reject Lease Agreement, for Relief from the Automatic Stay and Abandonment of Equipment or for Adequate Protection Filed by Robert Reiser & Co., Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 01:00 PM by *SECTION A TeleConference Line: 1-504-517-1385 Access Code 129611. (Congeni, Leo)
Related: [-] 54 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Robert Reiser & Co., Inc.
54 54 motion 01Relief from Stay Wed 04/30 10:19 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay and Abandonment of Equipment or for Adequate Protection . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Leo D. Congeni of Congeni Law Firm, LLC on behalf of Robert Reiser & Co., Inc. (Congeni, Leo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to 3
Att: 2 Declaration of Kevin Colmey
crditcrd none Wed 04/30 10:19 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 25-10676 ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt number A8523823, amount $ 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#54
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
53 53 court Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Tue 04/29 12:25 PM
Receipt of Declaration Re: Electronic Filing. (Nunnery, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
52 52 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/28 6:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by VFI KP SPE I LLC, Varilease Finance, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] (related document(s)49 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Varilease Finance, Inc., Creditor VFI KP SPE I LLC,51 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Varilease Finance, Inc., Creditor VFI KP SPE I LLC) (Meskey, Tait
51 51 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 5:56 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Tait Meskey of Snell & Wilmer LLP on behalf of VFI KP SPE I LLC, Varilease Finance, Inc. (Meskey, Tait)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
50 50 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/25 1:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Carey L. Menasco on behalf of Pataya Food Industries Ltd.. (Menasco, Carey)
Related: [-]
49 49 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 11:42 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Troy Aramburu of Snell & Wilmer LLP on behalf of VFI KP SPE I LLC, Varilease Finance, Inc. (Aramburu, Troy)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Notice of Address Update in re BNC Notice of Undeliverable Address Fri 04/25 10:25 AM
Notice of Address Update in re BNC Notice of Undeliverable Address - Thompson Welding and Mechanical Service Filed by Atlantic Natural Foods, LLC. (Caneco, Joseph)
Related: [-]