Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Referred: Susan Hightower
Case #: 1:25-cv-00501
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 19, 2025 4:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Chief of Police, Austin, Texas
Defendant
Chief of Police, Manor, Texas
Defendant
Governor Gregg Abbott
Defendant
Mayor of City of Austin Kirk Watson
Defendant
State of Texas
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
Black Persons Native Americans of State of Texas
Plaintiff
Chioma Okoro
Plaintiff
Christopher Okoro
Plaintiff
Jerome Okoro


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
5 5 misc Report and Recommendations Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/13 11:06 AM
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE : For these reasons, this Magistrate Judge GRANTS Plaintiff's2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and RECOMMENDS that the District Court DISMISS Plaintiff's lawsuit without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court ORDERS the Clerk to remove this case from this Magistrate Judge's docket and return it to the docket of the Honorable Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 respoth Affidavit in Support Tue 04/08 12:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Chioma Okoro. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/07 4:23 PM
STANDING ORDER (dated 2/21/2020) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/07 4:21 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chioma Okoro. (cnr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Chioma Okoro.(cnr) ( Attachment(s): #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cnr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/07 4:13 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cnr)
Related: [-]