Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:25-cv-02389
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 3:14 AM CDT
Defendant
St. Francis Hospital
Defendant
St. Francis Physician Network
Defendant
Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Defendant
Tenet Physician Resources
Plaintiff
Robert Wegner
Represented By
Alan G. Crone
The Crone Law Firm, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 05/02 5:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 DEFENDANTS TENET PHYSICIAN RESOURCES, SAINT FRANCIS PHYSICIAN NETWORK, LLC, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL AND TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/2/2025. (shl)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Fri 05/02 3:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants, proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Conley, Craig)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Cancellation Fri 05/02 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: THE MOTION HEARING RE ECF10 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION that was SET on MONDAY, MAY 5, 2025 at 1:30 P.M. before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman IS CANCELED. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 8:37 AM
NOTICE by St. Francis Hospital, St. Francis Physician Network, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources re23 Reply to Response to Motion, Executed Declaration of Leslie Malone (Conley, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/28 5:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 Reply to Response to Motion Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Reply Re His Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction filed by St. Francis Hospital, St. Francis Physician Network, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources.(Conley, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Leslie Malone(Unsigned)
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 6:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants, proposed order submitted filed by Robert Wegner. (Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/25 5:54 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants, proposed order submitted filed by Robert Wegner. (Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Transcript Fri 04/25 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4-16-25 before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Court Reporter Candace S. Covey, Telephone number 901-495-1216. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/30/2025. Redaction Request due 5/16/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2025. (Covey, Candace) (Main Document 20 replaced on 4/25/2025 at request of court reporter) (cbs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/23 7:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Robert Wegner. (Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion File Excess Pages Wed 04/23 6:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Robert Wegner. (Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence A. Wilbon on behalf of Robert Wegner (Wilbon, Clarence)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Setting Letter Wed 04/16 2:01 PM
SETTING LETTER: A MOTION HEARING RE ECF10 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION has been SET before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for MONDAY, MAY 5, 2025 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. The parties are instructed to have present any witnesses who will be needed for this hearing.(mmm)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Status Conference Wed 04/16 1:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Status Conference held on 4/16/2025. Alan G. Crone appeared for plaintiff. Craig C. Conley and Aubrey B. Gulledge appeared for defendants. Status of the case discussed. Plaintiff has until 4/25/2025 to respond to ECF8 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims against Defendants. Plaintiff should file a reply to ECF14 by Wednesday, 4/23/2025 and defendant's response to the reply is due Monday, 4/28/2025. A hearing on ECF10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction is set for Monday, 5/5/2025 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The hearing will be canceled if the Court determines that it is not needed. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 10 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/15 5:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction filed by St. Francis Hospital, St. Francis Physician Network, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources.(Conley, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice
13 13 notice Setting Letter Tue 04/15 9:07 AM
SETTING LETTER: A STATUS CONFERENCE has been SET before Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman for WEDNESDAY, APRIL 16, 2025 at 12:30 P.M. in Courtroom No. 1, 11th floor of the Federal Building, Memphis, Tennessee. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.(mmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/14 3:09 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 4/14/2025. (shl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Fri 04/11 9:53 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Order Submitted by Robert Wegner. (Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 04/11 9:50 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert Wegner.(Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Memorandum Memorandum in Support
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey B. Gulledge on behalf of All Defendants (Gulledge, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Compel Dismiss Fri 04/11 5:22 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants, proposed order submitted by St. Francis Hospital, St. Francis Physician Network, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources.(Conley, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Physicians Employment Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Fair Treatment Process Policy
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 8:32 AM
Summons Issued as to St. Francis Hospital, St. Francis Physician Network, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, and Tenet Physician Resources. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service.(mf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
6 6 notice Courtesy Notice Tue 04/08 8:15 AM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint,, filed by Robert Wegner has been filed. For future reference, please note civil cover sheet should be signed using an electronic format. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 04/08 8:14 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form (form AO 85) is available on the US Courts website at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms-rules/forms. (mf)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Tue 04/08 8:14 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Tue 04/08 8:13 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/08 8:13 AM
Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (mf)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 10:36 PM
COMPLAINT against St. Francis Hospital, St. Francis Physician Network, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Physician Resources (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4659224), filed by Robert Wegner.(Crone, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1, MBSAQIP Standards,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2, SFH Credentialing Policy,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 3, Notice of Termination,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4, ASMBS Ethics Letter