California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:25-bk-10557
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 07, 2025

Debtor
Shelter Care Plus Construct Corp
18539 Roscoe Blvd
Northridge, CA 91324-4632
Represented By
Sundee M Teeple
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeremy W. Faith (TR)
16030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 470
Encino, CA 91436
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/08/2025 1:14 AM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/07 7:36 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload([LINK:1:25-bk-10557] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B58259547. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 caseupld Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload Mon 04/07 7:27 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount filed by Sundee M Teeple on behalf of Shelter Care Plus Construct Corp. (Teeple, Sundee)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 04/07 7:29 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor Shelter Care Plus Construct Corp. (Teeple, Sundee)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Mon 04/07 7:42 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Faith (TR), Jeremy W. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/7/2025 at 11:30 AM via Zoom - Faith: Meeting ID 973 812 7924, Passcode 8746194099, Phone 1 747 281 2473. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]