Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:25-cv-21608
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 12:07 PM EDT
Defendant
BETSAL ENTERPRISES, INC
Defendant
MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE & 87TH AVENUE SUPERMARKET, INC.
Defendant
MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE, LLC
Plaintiff
Carlos Brito
Represented By
Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Garcia-Menocal P.L.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/30 11:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by BETSAL ENTERPRISES, INC. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/22 10:01 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carlos Brito identifying Other Affiliate Pablo Baez, AccessAble, Other Affiliate Jose A. Herran Jr., Other Affiliate Daniel F. Valdes, Other Affiliate Daniel R. Valdes, Other Affiliate Agustin Herran, Other Affiliate On Time Construction Corp, Other Affiliate Digna B. Alvarez for Carlos Brito (Diego, Ramon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 04/17 8:01 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Carlos Brito. BETSAL ENTERPRISES, INC served on 4/9/2025, response/answer due 4/30/2025. (Diego, Ramon)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 04/17 7:59 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Carlos Brito. MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE & 87TH AVENUE SUPERMARKET, INC. served on 4/11/2025, response/answer due 5/2/2025. (Diego, Ramon)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 04/17 7:58 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Carlos Brito. MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE, LLC served on 4/11/2025, response/answer due 5/2/2025. (Diego, Ramon)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/14 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan Andrew Zuckerman on behalf of MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE, LLC, MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE & 87TH AVENUE SUPERMARKET, INC.. Attorney Evan Andrew Zuckerman added to party MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Andrew Zuckerman added to party MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE & 87TH AVENUE SUPERMARKET, INC.(pty:dft). (Zuckerman, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 2:16 PM
Summons Issued as to BETSAL ENTERPRISES, INC, MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE & 87TH AVENUE SUPERMARKET, INC., MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE, LLC. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 04/08 2:11 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT against BETSAL ENTERPRISES, INC, MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE & 87TH AVENUE SUPERMARKET, INC., MIAMI GARDENS DRIVE, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18348828, filed by Carlos Brito.(Garcia-Menocal, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s),
Att: 4 Summon(s)