Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00999

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00065
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Southwest Recovery Services Inc.
176 Mine Lake Court Suite 100
Raleigh, NC 27615
Represented By
Southwest Recovery Services Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Southwest Recovery Services LLC
16200 Addison Road Suite 260
Addison, TX 75001
Represented By
Southwest Recovery Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James B Angell, Trustee
PO Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
A. Scott McKellar
Battle, Winslow, Scott & Wiley, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
admis Pay Fee-AP Mon 04/14 11:06 AM
Payment of AP Filing Fee in the amount of $350 filed by James B Angell on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Angell, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Mon 04/14 11:07 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Payment of AP Fee([LINK 25-00065 5-JNC] ) [admis,payfeeap] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A18471662, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/08 2:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on Southwest Recovery Services Inc. 4/8/2025; Southwest Recovery Services LLC 4/8/2025. filed by A. Scott McKellar on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/07 3:15 PM
Summons Issued on Southwest Recovery Services Inc. Answer Due 05/7/2025; Southwest Recovery Services LLC Answer Due 05/7/2025 (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/07 3:15 PM
Adversary case 25-00065 5. Complaint by James B Angell, Trustee against Southwest Recovery Services Inc., Southwest Recovery Services LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit