Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:25-cv-00677
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 1:06 PM CDT
Defendant
LOG Legal Group
Defendant
Emily Mueller
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant
Amy Ortis
Plaintiff
Rose Okpalobi


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/05 9:09 AM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants LOGS Legal Group, Emily Mueller, and Amy Ortis shall file a responsive pleading on or before May 28, 2025. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter. (lp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/02 2:11 PM
RE-NOTICE OF CALL-IN SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Due to a conflict on plaintiff counsel's calendar- the call-in scheduling conference is reset for 5/21/2025 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the dial-in instructions provided in this notice.(mmv)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/02 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF CALL-IN SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A call-in scheduling conference is set for 5/22/2025 09:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the dial-in instructions provided in this notice.(mmv)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/02 10:41 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by LOGS Legal Group, Emily Mueller, Amy Ortis.(Fagan, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 05/02 8:26 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, . **Document marked- FILED IN ERROR SEE CORRECT FILING- REC. DOC. 12.** (mmv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/01 5:09 PM
TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC shall file a responsive pleading on or before 5/23/2025. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter. (lp)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/01 4:42 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by LOGS Legal Group, Emily Mueller, Amy Ortis.(Fagan, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Email & Fax,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Email,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/01 4:24 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by LOGS Legal Group, Emily Mueller, Amy Ortis.Attorney George Davidson Fagan added to party LOGS Legal Group(pty:dft), Attorney George Davidson Fagan added to party Emily Mueller(pty:dft), Attorney George Davidson Fagan added to party Amy Ortis(pty:dft).(Fagan, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Email & Fax,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/30 1:50 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.Attorney Jonathan G. Wilbourn added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft).(Wilbourn, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/28 2:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 4/11/2025, answer due 5/2/2025.(Obioha, Pius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Domestic Return Receipt,
Att: 2 USPS Tracking Results,
Att: 3 Certified letter
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/28 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; LOGS Legal Group served on 4/11/2025, answer due 5/2/2025.(Obioha, Pius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Domestic Return Receipt
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/28 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Emily Mueller served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025.(Obioha, Pius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Domestic Return Receipt
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/28 2:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Amy Ortis served on 4/16/2025, answer due 5/7/2025.(Obioha, Pius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Domestic Return Receipt
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 10:16 AM
Summons Issued as to LOGS Legal Group. (mmv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to LOGS Legal Group, Emily Mueller, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Amy Ortis.(mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
3 3 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 04/08 3:51 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the SUMMONS. The pdfs should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. Also, the multiple summons were provided as one pdf- each summons should be provided as an individual pdf attachment for each defendant.** (mmv)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 04/08 3:08 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10952744) filed by Rose Okpalobi. Attorney Pius A Obioha added to party Rose Okpalobi(pty:pla).(Obioha, Pius) Modified text on 4/8/2025 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Amy Ortis,
Att: 3 Summons Emily Mueller,
Att: 4 Summons LOGS Legal Group