North Dakota District Court
Judge:Peter D Welte
Case #: 3:25-cv-00078
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 2:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Hon. Doug Burgum
Defendant
Matt Hogan
Defendant
Paul Souza
Defendant
United States Department of Interior
Defendant
United States Fish & Wildlife Service
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
Cody Peterson
Represented By
Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Austin Waisanen
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 04/24 11:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Cody Peterson. Doug Burgum, Matt Hogan, Paul Souza, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, and United States of America served on 4/18/2025, answer due 6/17/2025;(sl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service to Attorney General,
Att: 2 Proof of Service to Matt Hogan,
Att: 3 Proof of Service to Paul Souza,
Att: 4 Proof of Service to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service,
Att: 5 Proof of Service to United States Attorney,
Att: 6 Proof of Service to Department of Interior,
Att: 7 Proof of Service to Doug Burgum
utility Docket Correction Thu 04/24 11:54 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA at7 . (sl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/23 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cody Peterson. All Defendants(McCoy, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service to Attorney General,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of Service to Matt Hogan,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proof of Service to Paul Souza,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit Proof of Service to United States Attorney,
Att: 6 Exhibit Proof of Service to Department of Interior,
Att: 7 Exhibit Proof of Service to Doug Burgum
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 04/22 8:32 AM
(Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Reassignment Form Tue 04/22 8:30 AM
CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Cody Peterson. (pb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 04/08 1:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Doug Burgum, Matt Hogan, Paul Souza, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bl)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Direct Assignment Tue 04/08 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cody Peterson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/22/2025. (bl)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Doug Burgum, Matt Hogan, Paul Souza, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States of America (Filing fee $405, receipt number 300001210) filed by Cody Peterson.(bl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mr. Peterson's appeal to the Director of the Service with attachments and 2020 Map,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Directors Decision dated 3/25/2021,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet