New Mexico District Court
Judge:Kevin R Sweazea
Referred: Damian L Martinez
Case #: 1:25-cv-00343
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 2:08 PM MDT
Defendant
John Does 1-2
Defendant
Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.
Defendant
Trent Toulouse
Defendant
Larry Will
Plaintiff
Noah Carl
Represented By
Aaron Cress
Late Night Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Noah Carl (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noah Carl. Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc. served on 4/11/2025, answer due 5/2/2025. (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
3 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS and COMPLAINT served on RATIONALWIKI FOUNDATION, INC. on 4/11/2025, filed by Noah Carl. (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
Summons Issued as to John Does 1-2, Trent Toulouse, Larry Will. (jg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
2 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Noah Carl.(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9876736 re1 Complaint filed by Noah Carl (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez assigned. (dr)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc. (eh)
Related: [-]