North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:25-cv-00604
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 5:14 PM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
John O'Neil Egan
Represented By
Kevin Donovan
Rubenstein Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Special Appearance Thu 04/17 9:48 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Miriam Agrait on behalf of John O'Neil Egan. (Agrait, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Mon 04/14 2:55 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by John O'Neil Egan. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 4:44 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Miriam Fresco Agrait must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/14/2025. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Wed 04/09 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 5:05 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Donovan on behalf of John O'Neil Egan. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-8059025.), filed by John O'Neil Egan. (Donovan, Kevin)
Related: [-]