Kansas District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 2:25-cv-02183
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 5:08 PM CDT
Defendant
California Casualty Indemnity Exchange
Plaintiff
Darya Cline
Represented By
Maxwell Cory Nelson
Mcn Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Cline
Represented By
Maxwell Cory Nelson
Mcn Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
4 4 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Mon 04/28 12:00 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Darya Cline, William Cline upon California Casualty Indemnity Exchange served on 4/21/2025, answer due 5/12/2025 (Nelson, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Change of Firm Name or Address Tue 04/22 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by Maxwell Cory Nelson (Nelson, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 04/09 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (nac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 9:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to California Casualty Indemnity Exchange. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 5:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Darya Cline, William Cline. (Nelson, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Tue 04/08 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6626591.), filed by Darya Cline, William Cline.(Nelson, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D