California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:25-bk-12900
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
APG Express Inc.
1441 Huntington Dr PMB 259
South Pasadena, CA 91030-4512
Represented By
Giovanni Orantes
Orantes Law Firm PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Tue 04/22 6:32 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor APG Express Inc.. (Orantes, Giovanni)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Tue 04/22 6:28 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor APG Express Inc.. (Orantes, Giovanni)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 04/11 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/11 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Case Deficiency (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (BNC)
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/11 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor APG Express Inc.
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/11 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 04/09 1:35 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Geher, Thomas. (Geher, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Wed 04/09 12:17 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/7/2025 at 09:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/7/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 04/09 11:57 AM
Order: (1) Setting Conference on Status of Reorganization Case; (2) Requiring Debtor-In-Possession to Appear at Status Conference And File Report on Status of Reorganization Case, or Face Possible (A) Conversion of Case to Chapter 7; (B) Dismissal of Case; or (C) Appointment of Trustee; (3) Requiring Compliance With Standards Re Employment And Fee Applications; (4) Giving Notice of Probable Use of Court-Appointed Expert Witness for Contested Valuation Requests; (5) Mandating Use of Forms For Disclosure Statement And Plan; And (6) Establishing Procedure For (A) Motion for Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement; And (B) Motion For Order Confirming Plan (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/9/2025 (SC2)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Wed 04/09 8:50 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (SC2)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor APG Express Inc.
4 4 misc Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC) Wed 04/09 8:46 AM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) Related [+] (SC2)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor APG Express Inc.
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Wed 04/09 8:42 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Related [+] List of Equity Security Holders due 4/22/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 4/22/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 4/22/2025. (SC2)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor APG Express Inc.
court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 04/09 1:24 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 05/22/2025 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1368Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (TJ)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 court Process Paid Request for Certified Copy Tue 04/08 8:01 PM
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for a Certified Copy Tue 04/08 7:07 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :go@gobklaw.com: Filed by Debtor APG Express Inc. Related [+]. (Orantes, Giovanni)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/08 6:29 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by APG Express Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/22/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/22/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/22/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/22/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/22/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 04/22/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/22/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 04/22/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/22/2025. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 04/22/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 04/22/2025. (Orantes, Giovanni)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/08 6:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-12900] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58264829. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/08 7:11 PM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:25-bk-12900-VZ] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58265031. Fee amount 12.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc# 2