New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:25-cv-02911
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
NYU Lango and NYU Langone Kips Bay Gynecology
Represented By
Justin Anthony Guilfoyle
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gisela Vega


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 5:27 PM
ORDER OF REMAND re:11 Letter filed by NYU Langone Health System. The Court is in receipt of Defendant NYU Langone Health System's withdrawal of its Notice of Removal (ECF No. 11) and REMANDS this action back to the New York State Supreme Court, County of New York. 28 U.S.C. § 1447. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/1/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Mon 04/28 3:18 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Amy J. Traub dated April 28, 2025 re: Request to Withdraw Notice of Removal and Remand to State Court. Document filed by NYU Langone Health System..(Traub, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 order Order Thu 04/24 6:49 PM
Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2), "A civil action otherwise removable solely on the basis of the jurisdiction under section 1332(a) of this title may not be removed if any of the parties in interest properly joined and served as defendants is a citizen of the State in which such action is brought." This case was removed from New York county in New York state. As stated in the removal petition, Defendant is a citizen of New York. Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be remanded to state court for improper removal. Such showing shall be made in writing no later than May 6, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr) (Text Only Order) (Carter, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Payne Horning on behalf of NYU Langone Health System..(Horning, Payne)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/18 11:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Mermigis on behalf of Gisela Vega..(Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/10 11:52 AM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal,. SO ORDERED. (All Defendants.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/10/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/10 10:30 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Justin A. Guilfoyle dated April 10, 2025. Document filed by NYU Langone Health System..(Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Joy Traub on behalf of NYU Langone Health System..(Traub, Amy)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/09 12:18 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NYU Langone Health System..(Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/09 9:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Justin Anthony Guilfoyle to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here NYSD form page (lb)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 04/09 11:56 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Justin Anthony Guilfoyle re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 04/09 11:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Anthony Guilfoyle. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NYU Lango and NYU Langone Kips Bay Gynecology. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/09 11:58 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/09 11:59 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/09 11:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Wed 04/09 12:15 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents NYU Langone Kips Bay Gynecology added. Party added pursuant to1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by NYU Langone Kips Bay Gynecology. Related document:1 Notice of Removal,,..(Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/08 6:39 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NYU Lango and NYU Langone Kips Bay Gynecology..(Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/08 6:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/08 6:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 659352/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30901259).Document filed by NYU Lango and NYU Langone Kips Bay Gynecology..(Guilfoyle, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Derek Forte,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Index of Filings in State Court Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit B- State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Affirmation of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit D- Non-Compliance Termination Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit E- Affirmation of Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit F- Affirmation of Service