Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:25-cv-00374
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment - TDCJ Tue 04/29 2:57 PM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Michael Ray Chandler Jr. #01875978. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/24 11:04 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Ray Chandler, Jr. (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/09 3:35 PM
ORDER DENYING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rqr)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (No Doc#) Wed 04/09 3:39 PM
Mailed Order4 and IFP Application to Plaintiff (rqr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
3 3 misc Case Opening Letter Tue 04/08 9:45 AM
Case Opening Letter TO Michael Ray Chandler, Jr. (dtg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/08 9:43 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Ray Chandler, Jr. (dtg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT, filed by Michael Ray Chandler, Jr.(dtg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed WAIVER of Summons,
Att: 3 Copy of Envelope