Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Greg Gerard Guidry
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:25-cv-00661
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Rickie Nutik
Defendant
Young Audiences Charter School
Plaintiff
Shanda Quintal
6701 Stars and Stripes Blvd 8-19 W
New Orleans, LA 70126


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 4:23 PM
NOTICE REGARDING LOCAL CIVIL RULE 54.7(lb)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 4:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Rickie Nutik, Young Audiences Charter School.(lb)(cc Plaintiff w/ Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, Complaint)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/08 4:18 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 4/8/2025. (lb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pauper Letter
Saturday, April 05, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/08 10:06 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shanda Quintal. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (bwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/08 10:05 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Shanda Quintal.(bwn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Summons : Young Audiences Charter School,
Att: 3 Summons : Rickie Nutik,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet