California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:25-bk-12895
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 15, 2025

Debtor
Alliance Mechanical Group, Inc.
5838 San Fernando Rd Ste A
Glendale, CA 91202-2754
Represented By
Varand Gourjian
Gourjian Law Group
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Carolyn A Dye (TR)
Law Offices of Carolyn Dye 15030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 527
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 12:01 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/08 3:48 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-12895] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58263935. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/08 3:46 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Alliance Mechanical Group, Inc. (Gourjian, Varand)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Tue 04/08 3:54 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Alliance Mechanical Group, Inc.. (Gourjian, Varand)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 04/08 4:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Dye (TR), Carolyn A with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/15/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Dye: Meeting ID 393 921 9950, Passcode 5143532788, Phone 1 213 592 3167. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]