California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:25-bk-10905
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025

Debtor
SUSA ANAHEIM, LLC
1301 S State College Blvd
Anaheim, CA 92806-5726
Represented By
Leslie K Kaufman
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays Wood LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 12:02 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/08 4:48 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:25-bk-10905] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58264443. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/08 4:47 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by SUSA ANAHEIM, LLC (Kaufman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 04/08 7:07 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Marshack (TR), Richard A with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Marshack: Meeting ID 224 236 8893, Passcode 7892402221, Phone 1 657 222 4213. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]