California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-02969
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Jane Doe
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Plaintiff
Nima Tirgar Bahnemiri
23038 Califa Street
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Plaintiff
Ben Zakarya
23038 Califa Street
Woodland Hills, CA 91367


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/22 2:09 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 04/18 3:45 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-08699 SPG(AGRx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:25-cv-02969 SPG(AGRx). Signed by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/14 10:16 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 04/08 4:43 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mza)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/08 4:43 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mza)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/08 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (mza)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/08 4:40 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ben Zakarya. (mza)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 04/08 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Jane Doe, John Doe, Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (Filing fee $ 405. FEE PAID) Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiffs Ben Zakarya, Nima Tirgar Bahnemiri. (mza)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet