California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01603
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 12:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda (1)
Represented By
Michael Anthony Hernandez
Law Offices Of Michael Anthony Hernandez
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Hunter V. Norton
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 1:20 AM PDT
Sunday, April 06, 2025
Arrest of Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda (no document attached) (cxl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda.(cxl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda: Initial Appearance set for 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda held on 4/7/2025. Oral proffer confirmed. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda. Rule 5 advisement provided.( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/17/25 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Arraignment set for 5/06/25 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) Government oral motion to detain(Flight).( Detention Hearing - RF set for 4/9/2025 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) (Interpreter Ariela Edelson Torenberg). (CD# 4/7/2025 DDL 25-1:4:32;5:20-5:21). (Plaintiff Attorney Tyler Bramlet AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Arshi Baig, Juan Cabrales FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Ernesto Daniel Bedolla Ocegueda (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]