Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01523
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Luis David Tienda-Calixtro (1)
Represented By
Nicole Christine Bombara
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 3:01 AM CDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
Arrest of Luis David Tienda-Calixtro (mao)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Luis David Tienda-Calixtro. By Judge Anne T. Berton. (mao)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton as to Luis David Tienda-Calixtro. (mao)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Luis David Tienda-Calixtro. (mao)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mao)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton:Initial Appearance as to Luis David Tienda-Calixtro held on 4/7/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (T MCENENY) as to Luis David Tienda-Calixtro (Court Reporter ERO.) (mao)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Luis David Tienda-Calixtro ( Detention / Preliminary Hearing set for 4/10/2025 03:00 PM before Judge Anne T. Berton), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Luis David Tienda-Calixtro. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mao)
Related: [-]