Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:W Louis Sands
Case #: 7:25-cv-00041
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 4:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Cook County Board of Education
37 Josey Road
Adel, GA 31620
Defendant
Cook County School District
37 Josey Road
Adel, GA 31620
Defendant
Joy Folsom
37 Josey Road
Adel, GA 31620
Defendant
Becky Ratts
37 Josey Road
Adel, GA 31620
Defendant
Corkey Taylor
37 Josey Road
Adel, GA 31620
Plaintiff
Dr. Courtney Holley
Ste. 53 5425 Glenridge Drive
Atlanta, GA 30342
Represented By
JACK ROSENBERG
contact info
Plaintiff
Esquire Jack Rosenberg
Ste. 53 5425 Glenridge Drive
Atlanta, GA 30342


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Sunday, May 04, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 05/04 2:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CORKEY TAYLOR as to CORKEY TAYLOR. (ROSENBERG, JACK)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 05/04 2:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BECKY RATTS as to BECKY RATTS. (ROSENBERG, JACK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 05/04 2:33 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOY FOLSOM as to JOY FOLSOM. (ROSENBERG, JACK)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 05/04 2:32 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COOK COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT as to COOK COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (ROSENBERG, JACK)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 05/04 2:31 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COOK COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION as to COOK COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION. (ROSENBERG, JACK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 11:30 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(elp) (elp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Corkey Taylor,
Att: 2 Summons Cook County Board of Education,,
Att: 3 Summons Cook County School District
Att: 4 (4/9/2025) Summons Joy Folsom
1 1 misc Complaint Wed 04/09 1:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Courtney Holley Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4913424, $405 filed by Courtney Holley(ROSENBERG, JACK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons CCSD,
Att: 3 Summons CCBOE,
Att: 4 Summons Folsom,
Att: 5 Summons Ratts,
Att: 6 Summons Taylor