Original Case: 1:24-cv-00286

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-civil-01324
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
ME BOARD OF BAR OVERSEERS
Represented By
Jason David Anton
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Thomas A. Knowlton
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Heather Francis
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HON. VALERIE STANFILL, in their Official Capacity as Chief Justice, Maine Supreme Judicial Court
Represented By
Jason David Anton
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Aaron M. Frey
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Thomas A. Knowlton
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Heather Francis
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AMY QUINLAN, Esq., in their Official Capacity as State Court Administrator for the State of Maine, Judicial Branch
Represented By
Jason David Anton
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Aaron M. Frey
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Thomas A. Knowlton
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Heather Francis
ME Attorney General's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MAINE JUSTICE FOUNDATION
Represented By
Gavin G. McCarthy
Pierce Atwood LLP
contact info
Julia Brennan MacDonald
Pierce Atwood LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
E. DAVID WESCOTT, an individual residing in Dedham, County of Hancock, State of Maine
Represented By
Stephen C. Smith
Steve Smith Trial Lawyers
contact info
Kyle Singhal
Hopwood & Singhal PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RUSSELL JOHNSON BEAUPAIN, a Maine Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Stephen C. Smith
Steve Smith Trial Lawyers
contact info
Kyle Singhal
Hopwood & Singhal PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 4:58 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #29 ) filed by Appellants Russell Johnson Beaupain and E. David Wescott. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 04/22/2025. 25-1324 (ALW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF