New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01948
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 10:03 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.190.61.121
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
John C. Atkin
The Atkin Firm, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 14 2025
ORDER - Granting 8 Motion for Discovery, for the reasons set forth in the attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/14/2025. (PCM)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
11 11 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 05/14 2:28 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for June 13, 2025 at 3:00pm & deadline to submit Proposed Discovery Plan by June 6, 2025 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Atkin, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 05/14 6:17 PM
ORDER - Granting11 . The in-person initial conference scheduled for June 13, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. and the June 6, 2025 proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order deadline are adjourned sine die . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 5/14/2025. (PCM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 misc Status Report Mon 04/21 3:42 PM
STATUS REPORT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Atkin, John)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Mon 04/21 4:53 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a status report by July 9, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/21/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 04/14 10:01 PM
ORDER - Granting8 Motion for Discovery, for the reasons set forth in the attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/14/2025. (PCM)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Discovery Mon 04/14 3:53 PM
First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Atkin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Jorge Arco,
Att: 3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Patrick Paige,
Att: 4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Susan Stalzer,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 Mon 04/14 3:35 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (RC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint,
Att: 2 exhibit A
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/09 2:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on June 13, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than June 6, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/9/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 04/09 1:44 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 04/09 1:43 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/09 9:30 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Atkin, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice(Other) Wed 04/09 9:29 AM
NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright (Atkin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.190.61.121 filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18934311 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Atkin, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 1:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 04/09 1:45 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided. (KD)
Related: [-]