District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:25-cv-01070
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 11:06 AM EDT
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Defendant
STEPHEN EHIKIAN
Defendant
GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Defendant
PETER B. HEGSETH
Plaintiff
Baltimore-D.C. Metro Building and Construction Trades Council
Plaintiff
NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
17 17 2 pgs notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 05/08 12:15 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, STEPHEN EHIKIAN, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, PETER B. HEGSETH(Kurland, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Exhibit
Friday, May 02, 2025
16 16 32 pgs respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 05/02 1:23 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, filed by BALTIMORE-D.C. METRO BUILDING AND CONTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS. (Newman, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erich H. Lange on behalf of BALTIMORE-D.C. METRO BUILDING AND CONTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS (Lange, Erich)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
14 14 35 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 04/25 3:54 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, STEPHEN EHIKIAN, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, PETER B. HEGSETH.(Kurland, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 04/24 9:59 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PETER B. HEGSETH served on 4/17/2025 (Demree, Jacob)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 04/24 9:57 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 4/21/2025 (Demree, Jacob)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 04/24 9:55 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. STEPHEN EHIKIAN served on 4/21/2025 (Demree, Jacob)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Thu 04/24 9:53 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 4/17/2025 (Demree, Jacob)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Thu 04/24 9:40 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/18/2025. (Demree, Jacob)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Thu 04/24 9:37 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/9/2025. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2025. (Demree, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/16 10:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on or before April 25, 2025 and Plaintiffs shall file a reply in support of their motion on or before May 2, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/16/2025. (lcrc2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/15 8:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, STEPHEN EHIKIAN, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, PETER B. HEGSETH.(Kurland, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 8:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin S. Kurland on behalf of All Defendants (Kurland, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 4 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 04/10 2:27 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BALTIMORE-D.C. METRO BUILDING AND CONTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS.(Newman, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 31 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration Sean McGarvey Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to McGarvey Decl,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to McGarvey Decl,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to McGarvey Decl,
Att: 6 Exhibit D to McGarvey Decl,
Att: 7 Exhibit E to McGarvey Decl,
Att: 8 Exhibit F to McGarvey Decl,
Att: 9 Exhibit G to McGarvey Decl,
Att: 10 Declaration Akerman Declaration,
Att: 11 Exhibit A to Akerman Decl,
Att: 12 Exhibit B to Akerman Decl,
Att: 13 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status Thu 04/10 9:19 AM
RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Newman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newman, Jonathan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/9/2025) (znmw).. Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 4/17/2025. (zapb) 4/10/2025 (zapb)
Related: [-]
RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Newman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newman, Jonathan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/9/2025) (znmw).. Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 4/17/2025. (zapb) 4/10/2025 (zapb).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Robert Jason Aubrey on behalf of BALTIMORE-D.C. METRO BUILDING AND CONTRUCTION TRADES COUNCIL, NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS (Aubrey, Lucas) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/10/2025) (znmw).
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Newman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Newman, Jonathan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/9/2025) (znmw).
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 04/09 12:53 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 11:19 AM
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, STEPHEN EHIKIAN, GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, PETER B. HEGSETH ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11601324) filed by NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS, Baltimore-D.C. Metro Building and Construction Trades Council.(Demree, Jacob) (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/9/2025) (znmw).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons Summons to Attorney General,
Att: 6 Summons Summons to Department of Defense,
Att: 7 Summons Summons to Stephen Ehikian,
Att: 8 Summons Summons to General Services Administration,
Att: 9 Summons Summons to Peter B. Hegseth,
Att: 10 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 12:50 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmw)
Related: [-]