New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan S Trust
Case #: 8:25-bk-71391
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2025

Debtor
Amevan Cleaning Services INC
15 Barrington St
Westbury, NY 11590-4616
Represented By
Roberto L Pagan-Lopez
Pagan Lopez Law Office
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Marc A. Pergament
Marc A. Pergament, Trustee 400 Garden City Plaza Ste 309
Garden City, NY 11530
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 12:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/09 10:27 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $338 Filed by Roberto L Pagan-Lopez on behalf of Amevan Cleaning Services INC (Pagan-Lopez, Roberto)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Wed 04/09 10:28 AM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Roberto L Pagan-Lopez on behalf of Amevan Cleaning Services INC (Pagan-Lopez, Roberto)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Wed 04/09 11:03 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Business Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee, Pergament, Marc A., with 341(a) Meeting to be held on 5/20/2025 at 02:00 PM at Zoom.us/join - Pergament: Meeting ID 626 617 2846, Passcode 3244273243, Phone 1 (516)
Related: [-]