Consolidated
Lead case: 0:24-md-03108

Minnesota District Court
Judge:Donovan W Frank
Referred: Dulce J Foster
Case #: 0:25-cv-01213
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Michigan Eastern, 2:25-cv-10807
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 11:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC
Represented By
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
Defendant
Change Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
Defendant
Optum Inc.
Represented By
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
Defendant
UnitedHealthcare, Inc.
Represented By
Kimberly L. Scott
Miller, Canfield,
contact info
Plaintiff
Basha Diagnostics, P.C.
Represented By
Michelle Czapski
Bodman PLC
contact info
Nashara A. Latoya Peart
Bodman PLC
contact info
Erica Sarver
Bodman, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/09/2025 11:20 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
16 16 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Change Healthcare, Inc. Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 24-3108 (DWF/DJF) . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:24-md-3108-DWF-DJF . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Change Healthcare, Inc. Data Breach MDL website at:[LINK:https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/content/change-healthcare-inc-data-breach] . (kt)
Related: [-]
15 15 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:25-cv-10807. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster per MDL List.
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Transfer to the District of Minnesota for MDL 3108 (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14) to District of Minnesota for MDL # 3108. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14) for MDL # 3108. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings (ECF No.10 ). Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
10 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC, Change Healthcare, Inc., Optum Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare, Inc.. (Scott, Kimberly) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nashara A. Latoya Peart on behalf of Basha Diagnostics, P.C.. (Peart, Nashara) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Sarver on behalf of Basha Diagnostics, P.C.. (Sarver, Erica) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Thurber Czapski on behalf of Basha Diagnostics, P.C.. (Czapski, Michelle) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Scott, Kimberly) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by UnitedHealthcare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Healthcare Services, Inc. for UnitedHealthcare, Inc.. (Scott, Kimberly) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Optum Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Optum Inc.. (Scott, Kimberly) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Change Healthcare Technology Enabled Services, LLC (Scott, Kimberly) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Change Healthcare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Change Healthcare, Inc.. (Scott, Kimberly) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2025-212987-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10167492 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Scott, Kimberly) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 4/9/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Summons and Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. State Court Action Docket Sheet