Colorado District Court
Judge:Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:25-cv-01115
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 11:07 AM MDT
Defendant
Matthew S. Wallace
Plaintiff
Jo Ellis
Represented By
Margaret Haley Phelan
Equality Legal Action Fund
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 10:30 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/9/2025. Consent Form due by 6/4/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/11/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2025 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Wed 04/09 8:33 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Margaret Haley Phelan. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Wed 04/09 8:29 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 04/09 8:28 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 8:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Matthew S. Wallace (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10265297)Attorney Margaret Haley Phelan added to party Jo Ellis(pty:pla), filed by Jo Ellis.(Phelan, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons