Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-00999

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:25-ap-00066
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shopify Inc.
148 Lafayette Street
New York, NY 10012
Represented By
Shopify Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Shopify (USA) Inc.
2626 Glenwood Avenue Suite 550
Raleigh, NC 27608
Represented By
Shopify (USA) Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
James B Angell, Trustee
PO Box 12347
Raleigh, NC 27605
Represented By
A. Scott McKellar
Battle, Winslow, Scott & Wiley, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 04/23 10:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on Shopify (USA) Inc. 4/11/2025; Shopify Inc. 4/11/2025. filed by A. Scott McKellar on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
admis Pay Fee-AP Mon 04/14 11:08 AM
Payment of AP Filing Fee in the amount of $350 filed by James B Angell on behalf of James B Angell, Trustee. (Angell, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Mon 04/14 11:09 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Payment of AP Fee([LINK 25-00066 5-JNC] ) [admis,payfeeap] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A18471681, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 04/09 10:11 AM
Summons Issued on Shopify Inc. Answer Due 05/9/2025; Shopify (USA) Inc. Answer Due 05/9/2025 (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 10:11 AM
Adversary case 25-00066 5. Complaint by James B Angell, Trustee against Shopify Inc., Shopify (USA) Inc. (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (McKellar, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
utility Set Deadline (Private) Thu 04/10 7:00 AM
Answer due by 05/09/2025 (adi)
Related: [-]