Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:25-cv-00632
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Linx Legal, Inc.
2120 Crown Centre Drive Suite 100
Charlotte, NC 28227
Defendant
Rosario Craig Musumeci
Plaintiff
Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., f/k/a Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
6277 Sea Harbor Drive
Orlando, FL 32821
Represented By
Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
6277 Sea Harbor Drive
Orlando, FL 32821
Represented By
Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
6277 Sea Harbor Drive
Orlando, FL 32821
Represented By
Alfred J. Bennington, Jr.
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 05/08 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alfred J. Bennington, Jr on behalf of Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Alfred J. Bennington, Jr., Esq.. (Bennington, Alfred)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 9:58 AM
ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 20 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Patrick A. Bradford granted special admission to practice in the Middle District for purposes of this action pursuant to Local Rule 2.01(c), provided counsel shall register for and use the electronic filing system as adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 5/8/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 4:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Patrick A. Bradford to appear pro hac vice Amended by Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/07 4:09 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Glennys Ortega Rubin, Benjamin Francis Elliott, and Alfred J. Bennington, Jr. of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 5:06 PM
**COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE, FILING ATTORNEY IS MISSING SIGNATURE** Unopposed MOTION for Patrick A. Bradford to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-23329349 for $150 by Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci. (Sykes, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. Modified text on 5/7/2025 (GL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of appearance Wed 04/30 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Panda Kroll on behalf of Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci (Kroll, Panda)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Interested Persons Order Wed 04/30 9:06 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for Defendants Linx Legal, Inc. and Rosario Craid Musumeci. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/14/2025. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/30/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 04/29 5:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Linx Legal and Rosario Craig Musumeci must respond to the Complaint by 5/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/29/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 04/29 4:31 PM
Time Sensitive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint Unopposed by Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci. (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Tue 04/29 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michael Sykes on behalf of Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci (Sykes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 04/29 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Joseph Bennett on behalf of Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci. Lead Counsel: John J. Bennett. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 04/25 11:01 AM
NOTICE of a related action Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Rubin, Glennys)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/24 10:00 AM
NOTICE by Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. re3 Interested Persons Order Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Rubin, Glennys)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/24 9:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Interested Persons Order Plaintiffs' Disclosure Statement by Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc. f/k/a Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.; Corporate Parent Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc. f/k/a Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.; Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc. (Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 4/24/2025 to edit docket text. (WLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 service Summons returned executed Fri 04/18 3:12 PM
RETURN of service executed on Aprill 11, 2025 by Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. as to Linx Legal, Inc.. (Elliott, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons returned executed Fri 04/18 3:10 PM
RETURN of service executed on April 11, 2025 by Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. as to Linx Legal, Inc.. (Elliott, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 order Standing Order Wed 04/16 11:19 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 service Summons issued Thu 04/10 2:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci. (MCB)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Trademark Report Thu 04/10 1:21 PM
Trademark Report electronically sent to the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (MCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Interested Persons Order Thu 04/10 9:57 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 4/10/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/09 2:29 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:25-cv-632-GAP-DCI. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Linx Legal, Inc., Rosario Craig Musumeci (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23225681) filed by Travel + Leisure Resort Development, Inc., f/k/a Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc..(Bennington, Alfred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons