Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:25-cv-00226
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Pittsburg Tank & Tower Company, Inc.
1 Watertank Place
Henderson, KY 42420
Defendant
Pittsburg Tank & Tower Group, Inc.
1 Watertank Place
Henderson, KY 42420
Defendant
Pittsburg Tank and Tower Maintenance Co., Inc.
1 Water Tank Place PO Box 913
Henderson, KY 42419
Plaintiff
Homeland Insurance Company of New York
605 Highway 169 North Suite 800
Plymouth, MN 55441
Represented By
Aaron Michael Glasgow
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Brian Charles Menge
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 04/24 10:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Pittsburg Tank & Tower Company, Inc., Pittsburg Tank & Tower Group, Inc., Pittsburg Tank and Tower Maintenance Co., Inc.. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/23 4:01 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On Pittsburg Tank & Tower Maintenance Co., Inc. (Glasgow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/23 4:01 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On Pittsburg Tank & Tower Company, Inc. (Glasgow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/23 3:59 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On Pittsburg Tank & Tower Group, Inc. (Glasgow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/23 3:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Glasgow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/23 3:45 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Homeland Insurance Company of New York re1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Glasgow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice) Wed 04/09 1:25 PM
Notice of Deficiency re: Civil Cover Sheet missing. Related Document:1 Complaint, filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. Deficiency Deadline by 5/9/2025. (kev) (kev)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Pittsburg Tank & Tower Group, Inc., Pittsburg Tank & Tower Company, Inc., Pittsburg Tank and Tower Maintenance Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10455206), filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Glasgow, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Contract Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Assignment R&L to Sierra Piedmont,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Assignment of Claim to Homeland Ins. Co.
misc Docket Annotation Wed 04/09 1:22 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kev)
Related: [-]