New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:25-bk-10694
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Publishers Clearing House LLC
P.O. Box 610
Hicksville, NY 11802
Represented By
Stephanie R Sweeney
Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Stevens, LLP
contact info
Lauren Catherine Kiss
Klestadt Winters Jureller
contact info
Tracy L. Klestadt
Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Ste
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 8:26 PM EDT
Creditor
Prestige Capital Finance, LLC
3 Becker Farm Road
Roseland, NJ 07068
Represented By
Vincent J. Roldan
Mandelbaum Salsburg PC
contact info
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of WARN ACT Claimants
Represented By
Michael S. Fox
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info
Creditor
Michelle Dank
62 Belmont Circle
Syosset, NY 11791
Represented By
Warren S. Dank
Warren S. Dank, Esq., P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.
Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. 5955 DeSoto Ave., Suite 100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Tara Tiantian
Doj-Ust
contact info
Unknown
PAPA Holdings LLC
Represented By
Marsha Sukach
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Unknown
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Kenneth P. Silverman
Rimon P. C.
contact info
Brian Powers
Rimon P.C.
contact info
Ronald J. Friedman
Rimon P. C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
58 58 notice Notice, Agenda Tue 04/29 9:06 PM
Notice of Agenda Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for Thursday, May 1, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. (EST) filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
57 57 notice Notice, Hearing Tue 04/29 8:52 PM
Notice of Hearing Joint Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) Objections due by 5/9/2025, (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 55 ,43 ,35 ,36 ,33 ,56 ,54 ,37 ,34 ,32
56 56 15 pgs motion Application, Employ Tue 04/29 8:37 PM
Application to Employ SSG Advisors, LLC as Investment Banker to the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC Responses due by 5/9/2025,. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Victor Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit C - SSG Engagement Letter
55 55 10 pgs motion Motion, Reject Tue 04/29 7:45 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 365(A), Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts as of the Petition Date filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC with hearing to be held on 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) Responses due by 5/9/2025,. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
54 54 9 pgs motion Motion, Authorize Tue 04/29 7:19 PM
Motion to Authorize Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Implementing Certain Notice and Case Management Procedures filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC with hearing to be held on 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) Responses due by 5/9/2025,. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
53 53 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Tue 04/29 6:08 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Notice of Filing of Amended Proposed Final Order Authorizing the Debtor to (A) Continue to Use Its Existing Cash Management System; and (B) Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms Related [+] filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC.(Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Final Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redlined Version of Proposed Final Order
52 52 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Tue 04/29 5:01 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Notice of Filing of Proposed Final Order Approving Debtor-in-Possession Financing Motion Related [+] filed by Stephanie R Sweeney on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC. (Sweeney, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 8
51 51 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Tue 04/29 4:59 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Notice of Filing of Proposed Final Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Obligations to Prize Winners and Critical Vendors and Continue Customer Programs Related [+] filed by Stephanie R Sweeney on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC. (Sweeney, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 9
50 50 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 04/29 4:35 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Brian Powers on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Powers, Brian)
Related: [-]
49 49 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 04/29 4:33 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald J. Friedman on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Friedman, Ronald)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 04/29 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kenneth P. Silverman on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Silverman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
47 47 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Tue 04/29 9:56 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Gary Krasna, Esq. filed by Vincent J. Roldan on behalf of Prestige Capital Finance, LLC. (Roldan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 04/29 9:57 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 25-10694 mg] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17053987. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #47
Monday, April 28, 2025
46 46 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 04/28 4:28 PM
Affidavit of Service Verification of Notice of Commencement Published in USA Today Related [+] Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 28
Friday, April 25, 2025
45 45 notice Notice, Appearance Fri 04/25 12:03 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Marsha Sukach on behalf of PAPA Holdings LLC. (Sukach, Marsha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
44 44 1 pgs notice Notice, Appointing Creditors Committee Thu 04/24 11:48 AM
Notice Appointing Creditors Committee Notice of Appointment of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Tara Tiantian on behalf of United States Trustee. (Tiantian, Tara)
Related: [-]
43 43 14 pgs motion Application, Employ Thu 04/24 10:20 AM
Application to Employ Getzler Henrich as Chief Restructuring Officer filed by Stephanie R Sweeney on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC Responses due by 5/9/2025, with presentment to be held on 5/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Sweeney, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Engagement Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
42 42 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Wed 04/23 5:06 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors filed by Stephanie R Sweeney on behalf of Publishers Clearing House LLC. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Sweeney, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 04/23 11:06 AM
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing [Docket No. 29] Related [+] filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc..(Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 29
40 40 ans Statement Wed 04/23 11:05 AM
Statement (Verified Statement of Ad Hoc Group Pursuant to Rule 2019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure) filed by Michael S. Fox on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of WARN ACT Claimants. (Fox, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
39 39 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 04/22 5:35 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Enter Into a Post-Petition Senior Secured Financing Facility; (II) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (III) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 23] and Interim Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b)(1), 363(c)(1), 1107(a) and 1108 (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Pay and Honor Prepetition Obligations to Prize Winners and Critical Vendors and Otherwise Continue Customer Programs and Practices in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Authorizing and Directing the Disbursement Banks to Honor and Process Related Checks and Transfers [Docket No. 24] Related [+] filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc..(Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 23 ,24
38 38 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 04/22 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Warren S. Dank on behalf of Michelle Dank. (Dank, Warren)
Related: [-] 13