Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Roseann A Ketchmark
Case #: 4:25-cv-00252
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Victoria Brown
Defendant
Chad Vanderpol
Plaintiff
Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By
James Keaney
Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard, Pc-St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 05/22 8:01 PM
STIPULATION Granting Allstate's Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction by Allstate Insurance Company. (Humphrey, J)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/22 3:24 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Julie E Parisi on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Julie E Parisi added to party Victoria Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Julie E Parisi added to party Chad Vanderpol(pty:dft))(Parisi, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/20 3:54 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's show cause response due by 5/22/2025. Signed on 5/20/2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 misc Supplement Wed 04/30 10:42 AM
SUPPLEMENT Certificate of Compliance with D.I. 16 . Related [+] (Humphrey, J)
Related: [-] 9
17 17 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 04/30 10:31 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Victoria Brown served on 4/19/2025, answer due 5/12/2025. (Humphrey, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 order Order Tue 04/29 12:47 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendants of (1) the pending motion for preliminary injunction (Doc.9 ) and (2) the notice of hearing (Doc. 15) scheduling a preliminary injunction hearing for 5/29/2025 at 1:30 PM. Plaintiff shall file with the Court a certificate of compliance that Defendants have been so notified on or before 5/8/2025. Signed on 4/29/2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/29 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/29/2025 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Transferring/Reassigning Case Tue 04/29 10:39 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark for all further proceedings. District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is now: 4 25-00252 CV-W-RK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Faris, Andrea)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order of Recusal Tue 04/29 10:10 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court is directed to randomly reassign this matter for all further proceedings. Signed on 4/29/25 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Mon 04/28 7:05 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re11 MOTION to expedite / Motion For Expedited Discovery - Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Companys Motion For Expedited Discovery filed by J Scott Humphrey on behalf of Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company. Related [+] (Humphrey, J)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Expedited Discovery to Defendants
11 11 motion Expedite Mon 04/28 7:02 PM
MOTION to expedite / Motion For Expedited Discovery filed by J Scott Humphrey on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/12/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Humphrey, J)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Mon 04/28 6:46 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re9 MOTION for preliminary injunction / Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Companys Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction filed by J Scott Humphrey on behalf of Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company. Related [+] (Humphrey, J)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 04/28 6:27 PM
MOTION for preliminary injunction / Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction filed by J Scott Humphrey on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/12/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Humphrey, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/18 9:08 AM
ORDER granting5 ,6 &7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Noelle B. Torrice, Katie M. Burnett and J. Scott Humphrey for Allstate Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 2:47 PM
Motion to allow J. Scott Humphrey to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9538598) filed by James Keaney on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company.(Keaney, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 2:45 PM
Motion to allow Katie M. Burnett to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9538592) filed by James Keaney on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company.(Keaney, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 2:42 PM
Motion to allow Noelle B. Torrice to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9538557) filed by James Keaney on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company.(Keaney, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of MAPN Wed 04/09 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
3 3 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Wed 04/09 1:43 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James Keaney on behalf of Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company.(Keaney, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Wed 04/09 1:42 PM
NOTICE of filing Intent to Use Process Server by Allstate Insurance Company (Keaney, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/09 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Victoria Brown, Chad Vanderpol filed by James Keaney on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9524956. Service due by 7/8/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Keaney, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Wed 04/09 3:48 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Victoria Brown, Chad Vanderpol. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]