Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:25-cv-00387
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
6 6 order Judgment Wed 04/09 3:39 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: The petition of Lemuette Krinisha McKinney pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/9/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 3:33 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Because she has not exhausted her state court remedies, no purpose would be served by transferring this case to the district where Petitioner is confined and where the underlying judgment was entered. 28 U.S.C. § 2241(d). Thus, Petitioner's habeas claims are DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/9/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/09 1:19 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's habeas claims are SEVERED from her civil rights claims. The Clerk is DIRECTED to: (1) open a new 28 U.S.C. §2254 action assigned to the docket of the undersigned and (2) docket a copy of Plaintiff's pleading, ECF No.1 , and this order in the new case. (Docketed in case 4:25-CV-299-O). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/9/2025) (sre)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 04/09 1:34 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,4. Wed Apr 9 13:34:49 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 04/09 3:40 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Wed Apr 9 15:40:12 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
3 3 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 04/09 1:15 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Wed 04/09 1:14 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: Appropriate Staff Attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 04/09 1:12 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lemuette Krinisha McKinney. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
Related: [-]