Tucker v. Dillon Companies, Inc.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Nina Y Wang |
Referred: | Timothy P O'Hara |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-01123 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Adams County District Court, 2025CV30211 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:05 PM MDT |
Defendant
Dillon Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Tucker
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, ) |
|
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() SUMMONS REQUEST as to Triad Service Solutions, LLC by Plaintiff Jennifer Tucker. (Robbins, Madeline) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Thu 05/08 8:42 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re:20 Amended Complaint filed by attorney Madeline S. Robbins.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix a complete address block with up-to-date contact information to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Dillon Companies, Inc., filed by Jennifer Tucker.(Robbins, Madeline) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jennifer Tucker(Robbins, Madeline) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Leave
Tue 05/06 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's17 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED . Plaintiff shall file a clean copy of her Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on or before 5/8/2025 . The Court notes, however, that Plaintiff's Motion fails to comply with Local Rule 15.1, which states that "[a] party ... who files an amended pleading ... with the consent of the opposing party shall file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading and shall attach as an exhibit a copy of the amended pleading which strikes through (e.g., strikes through ) the text to be deleted and underlines (e.g., underlines ) the text to be added." D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a). Although Plaintiff filed a clean copy of her Amended Complaint with her Motion to Amend, she did not file the required redlined version. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that on or before 5/8/2025 , Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Amended Pleading, separate from her Amended Complaint , that includes as an attachment a redlined version of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/06/2025. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, ) |
|
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jennifer Tucker.(Robbins, Madeline) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTY by Defendant Dillon Companies, Inc.. (Lewis, Dylan) |
|
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Defendant's ANSWER to5 Complaint by Dillon Companies, Inc..(Larson, Ashley) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Paige Singleton by Susan Paige Singleton on behalf of Jennifer TuckerAttorney Susan Paige Singleton added to party Jennifer Tucker(pty:pla) (Singleton, Susan) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dylan G. Lewis on behalf of Dillon Companies, Inc.Attorney Dylan G. Lewis added to party Dillon Companies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lewis, Dylan) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Madeline Scott Robbins by Madeline Scott Robbins on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Madeline Scott Robbins added to party Jennifer Tucker(pty:pla) (Robbins, Madeline) |
|
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 04/10/2025. Pursuant to the Order of Reference, the Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on July 2, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. This will be an in-person proceeding. This will be an in-person proceeding. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) jointly email a Word Copy of the proposed Scheduling Order, copying all Parties, to Chambers at[LINK:o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] . (ggill, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/10 8:05 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 04/10/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (echa, ) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/09 1:53 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara. Text Only Entry. (echa, ) |
|
7 | 7
![]() STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by District Court Judge Patrick Harold Pugh on 03/20/2025. (echa, ) |
|
6 | 6
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand, District Civil Case Cover Sheet, District Civil Case Summons upon Dillon Companies, Inc. on 03/10/2025. (echa, ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() COMPLAINT For Damages and Jury Demand against Dillon Companies, Inc., filed by Jennifer Tucker.(echa, ) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Wed 04/09 1:49 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (echa, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Removal: Administrative Notices
Wed 04/09 1:49 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (echa, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Dillon Companies, Inc.. (Larson, Ashley) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dillon Companies, Inc. from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2025CV030211. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10267297), filed by Dillon Companies, Inc..(Larson, Ashley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |