California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 2:25-cv-03098
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 04/23 8:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney JohnPaul Lecedre on behalf of Defendant Warden Lompoc FCI (Attorney JohnPaul Lecedre added to party Warden Lompoc FCI(pty:dft))(Lecedre, JohnPaul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 4 pgs order Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition Tue 04/15 3:15 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Respondent Warden Lompoc FCI file Answer to the Petition not later than 6/30/2025. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (dc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PETITION
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 transfer Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form Mon 04/14 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all proceedings in accordance with General Order 05-07. Case number will now read as 2:25-cv-03098-CV-SHK. (nhac)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/11 9:52 AM
PETITION with filing fee previously paid (5.00 paid on 04/09/2025, receipt number 39474192), filed by Petitioner Damien Cesena.(Ciocca, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D
3 3 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 04/11 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Fri 04/11 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cynthia Valenzuela and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 2:16 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. ACACDC-39474192 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner Damien Cesena. (Attorney Patrick M Ciocca added to party Damien Cesena(pty:pet))(Ciocca, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Declaration Of Atty. Ciocca,
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D