Darwin Boggs v. Hairrrs Johnnys Barber Shop et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00867 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Defendant
Leandro Fattori
|
|
Defendant
Hairrrs Johnnys Barber Shop
|
|
Plaintiff
Darwin Boggs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S CALIFORNIA STATE LAW CLAIMS (DKT.11 ). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/29 1:45 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has received Plaintiff's Response (the "Response") to the Court's OSC issued on April 15, 2025. [Dkt. 9, 11]. In view of the Response, the Court hereby VACATES the OSC hearing set for May 2, 2025. A separate order addressing the matter of supplemental jurisdiction will be issued by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Darwin Boggsto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,9 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Response to Order to Show Cause due by noon on 4/25/2025., Show Cause Hearing set for 5/2/2025 01:00 PM via zoom, before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes.) (twdb) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Leandro Fattori, Hairrrs Johnnys Barber Shop. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (sh) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Darwin Boggs. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Darwin Boggs. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39472808 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Darwin Boggs(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |