California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:25-cv-03101
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 25STCV05458
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Apria Healthcare, LLC
Represented By
Allison M. Scott
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fernando E. Hernandez


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 05/08 9:18 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
12 12 misc Miscellaneous Document Fri 05/02 3:24 PM
JOINT RULE 26 (f) REPORT (Baltaxe, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 2:50 PM
AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLIANT filed by Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC. (Juvinall, Kate)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 04/25 11:38 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kate Elsa Juvinall counsel for Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC. Adding Kate Juvinall as counsel of record for Apria Healthcare, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC. (Attorney Kate Elsa Juvinall added to party Apria Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft))(Juvinall, Kate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 04/15 10:48 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/16/2025 at 01:00 PM. See Attached Order for Details. If all parties agree to the dates in the 26(f)report, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. (hc)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 04/15 10:44 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 04/13 10:58 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 04/13 10:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 04/13 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 1:44 PM
Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC, (Scott, Allison)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Wed 04/09 1:41 PM
DECLARATION of Caitlin Marticorena re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC. (Scott, Allison)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 1:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC. (Scott, Allison)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 1:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 25STCV05458 Receipt No: ACACDC-39473786 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC. (Attorney Allison M. Scott added to party Apria Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft))(Scott, Allison)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Sun 04/13 9:10 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Apria Healthcare, LLC, Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Fernando E. Hernandez. Filed in State Court on 2/26/2025 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Sun 04/13 9:14 AM
NON-CONFORMED CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Fernando E. Hernandez, upon Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC served on 3/10/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon By Serving C.T. Corporation Systems, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Submitted with Exhibit J to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Sun 04/13 9:17 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Apria Healthcare, LLC. Filed in State Court on 4/8/2025 Submitted with Exhibit K to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]