California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:25-cv-00871
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:San Bernardino, CIVRS2500917
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 3:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Alexi R. Doft
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark King


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 04/16 4:34 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 04/13 11:03 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 04/13 11:02 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 04/13 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/09 2:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 , Jury Demand2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 4/9/2025. (Doft, Alexi)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 2:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Doft, Alexi)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Doft, Alexi)
Related: [-]
2 2 trial Jury Demand Wed 04/09 2:52 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Doft, Alexi)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVRS2500917 Receipt No: ACACDC-39474774 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Alexi R. Doft added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Doft, Alexi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Alexi R. Doft,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Ford's Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - All Pleadings,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - 10-K Filing
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Sun 04/13 9:52 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10,inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Mark King. Filed in State Court on 2/11/2025 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Sun 04/13 9:54 AM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]