v. AvalonBay Communities, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:25-cv-00729 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2025 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 3:05 PM PDT |
Defendant
AvalonBay Communities, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Julia Brucato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Renault
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Renault
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
13 | 13
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julia Brucato, Phillip Renault, Kristin Renault, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Avalonbay Communities, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Kim, Raymond) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc. (twdb) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of interested parties [10-1]. The following error(s) was/were found: The notice of interested parties should be filed in a separate docket entry using the event (Notice of Interested Parties). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Julia Brucato, Kristin Renault, Phillip Renault.(Kim, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Julia Brucato, Kristin Renault, Phillip Renault.(Kim, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mza) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Attachment(s): # 1 Civil Cover Sheet. The document(s) should have been filed separately using their true events. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. Attachment(s): #2 Summons. The document(s) should have been filed separately using their true events. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (mza) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (rrp) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (mza) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mza) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (mza) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39474655 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Julia Brucato, Kristin Renault, Phillip Renault. (Attorney Raymond Yoon Ho Kim added to party Julia Brucato(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond Yoon Ho Kim added to party Kristin Renault(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond Yoon Ho Kim added to party Phillip Renault(pty:pla))(Kim, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |