Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 3:25-bk-31178
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Treasure Valley, LLC
3585 NE 207th St Ste C9 # 8000610
Miami, FL 33180-3772
Represented By
MARK G PASSANNANTE
Broer & Passannante, P.S.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
1220 SW 3rd Ave., Rm. 315
Portland, OR 97204


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 misc Missing Documents Filed Thu 04/24 3:43 PM
Missing Documents: Schedule H: Filed By Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Employ [LBF 1114 - 12/1/22 may apply] Thu 04/24 3:41 PM
First Amended Application to Employ and Supporting Document(s). Filed by Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
16 16 4 pgs motion Employ [LBF 1114 - 12/1/22 may apply] Thu 04/24 11:49 AM
Application to Employ Mark G. Passannante of Broer & Passannante, P.S. Filed by Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
15 15 misc List of Creditors with 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Wed 04/23 6:06 PM
List of Creditors with 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed By Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Missing Documents Filed Wed 04/23 6:04 PM
Missing Documents: Schedule A/B: Schedule D: Schedule E/F: Schedule G: Summary of Assets and Liabilities: Declaration: Statement of Financial Affairs and Declaration: Filed By Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/23 5:02 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed By Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Attorney Disclosure of Compensation [May Require LBF 1305 - 12/1/24] Wed 04/23 3:15 PM
Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation Filed By Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sun 04/20 9:07 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:10 Order Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 09:00AM in Courtroom 4, Portland. Case Management Documents Due By 05/7/2025. (dsg). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
10 10 order Setting Case Management Conference Fri 04/18 8:35 AM
Order Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 09:00AM in Courtroom 4, Portland. Case Management Documents Due By 05/7/2025. (dsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
9 9 misc Correspondence Thu 04/17 1:13 PM
Correspondence Re: LBR 1073-1 Elect to remain In District of Oregon/ Malheur Co Filed By Debtor Treasure Valley, LLC (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 04/12 9:08 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:3 Order and Notice Regarding Time to File Documents; and Notice of Proposed Dismissal. (asg). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 04/12 9:08 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:4 Order of Designation, and Notice of Chapter 11 Financial Reporting and Mailing Requirements Monthly Operating Report due by 5/21/2025. (asg). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/12 9:08 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice of5 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines with Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Portland. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2025 at 01:30 PM via 341 Meeting via Telephone (UST). Dial 866-564-0532, passcode 8835427. Proofs of Claims due by 06/18/2025. (Steven, Heather). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 court Notice of Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11/12 Thu 04/10 12:00 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines with Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee, Portland. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/6/2025 at 01:30 PM via 341 Meeting via Telephone (UST). Dial 866-564-0532, passcode 8835427. Proofs of Claims due by 06/18/2025. (Steven, Heather)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Designation/Monthly Operating Reports Thu 04/10 9:25 AM
Order of Designation, and Notice of Chapter 11 Financial Reporting and Mailing Requirements Monthly Operating Report due by 5/21/2025. (asg)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order and Notice Re: Time to File Documents Thu 04/10 9:02 AM
Order and Notice Regarding Time to File Documents; and Notice of Proposed Dismissal. (asg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 04/09 3:24 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Attorney Ch 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 25-31178 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A22337356. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 8 pgs misc Attorney Ch 11 Voluntary Petition Wed 04/09 3:23 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $1738 Exclusivity Period Expires 08/7/2025. (PASSANNANTE, MARK)
Related: [-]