California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:25-cv-00873
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2025
Case in other court:San Bernardino County Superior Court, CIVSB2503061
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 4:07 PM PDT
Defendant
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By
Ashley E Maxwell
Wilson Turner Kosmo, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hipolito Garcia


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 04/25 11:59 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/25 11:57 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 13, 2025
8 8 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal - (CV-52) Tue 04/15 2:05 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Case transferred from Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 5:25-cv-00873-FMO(SHKx). (ap)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/11 4:06 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/11 4:06 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/11 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/09 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Maxwell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
3 3 trial Jury Demand Wed 04/09 3:49 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. (Maxwell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/09 3:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Maxwell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/09 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2503061 Receipt No: ACACDC-39475828 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Ashley E Maxwell added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Maxwell, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ASHLEY MAXWELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF REMOVAL,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Proof of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 04/11 4:17 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Hipolito Garcia. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/29/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 04/11 4:18 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
Related: [-]